skip to content

Qureshi, Shahzad

CPSO#: 89731

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: 9058532222 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G1N2
Canada
Phone: 9055050950
Fax: 9058419404
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shahzad Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Qureshi ( CPSO# 89731 )

Business Address:
14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Phone Number: (905) 505-0950

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
300-535 Mulock Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5H2
Phone Number: (905) 953-9044

Business Address:
21-117 Yonge Street
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9
Phone Number: (705) 434-0074

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:02 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAHZAD QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 12, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)