skip to content

Shahzad, Karina

CPSO#: 86316

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen Medical Centre
Unit 4A
128 Queen Street South
Mississauga ON  L5M 1K8
Phone: (905) 997-7713
Fax: (905) 997-7714 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1224 dundas street west
Mississauga ON  L5C4G7
Canada
Phone: 905-275-1111
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr.Karina Shahzad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shahzad ( CPSO# 86316 )

Business Address:
6975 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga ON  L5N 2W7
Phone Number: (905) 812-4874

Business Address:
Queen Medical Centre
Unit 4A
128 Queen Street South
Mississauga ON  L5M 1K8
Phone Number: (905) 997-7711

Business Address:
1224 Dundas Street West
Suite 108
Mississauga ON  L5C 4G7
Phone Number: (905) 275-1111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KARINA SHAHZAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHZAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2010