skip to content

Shahid, Shaneela

CPSO#: 86930

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ziauddin Medical University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Center
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-3437 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-2383
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
327 Reynold Street
Oakville ON  L6J 3L7
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-6666
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Unit 9
497 Laurier Ave
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Canada
Phone: (905) 203-0624
Fax: 2892702970
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shaneela Shahid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shahid ( CPSO# 86930 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 336-9607

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 336-9607

Business Address:
9 - 497 Laurier Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 3K8
Phone Number: (905) 203-0624

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHANEELA SHAHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Pediatrics

Western University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2011