skip to content

Shah, Tara

CPSO#: 28555

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Dhirani, Tahera Husain (used until: 08 May 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Bombay, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tara Dhirani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 14 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 01 Jun 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014