skip to content

Shah, Shreyans

CPSO#: 95442

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Booth Neurology
343 Booth Street, Unit B
Ottawa ON  K1R7K1
Phone: (613) 233-3030 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Neurology Centre of Toronto
491 Eglinton Ave. West
Suite 100
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Canada
Phone: 416 860-7554
Fax: (416) 860-7559
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Carleton Place & District Memorial
211 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: (613) 257-2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: DR. SHREYANS SHAH PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shah ( CPSO# 95442 )

Business Address:
100-491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: 4168607554

Business Address:
Unit B- 343 Booth St
Ottawa ON  K1R 7K1
Phone Number: 6132333030

Business Address:
211 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone Number: 6132572200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHREYANS SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2017