skip to content

Shah, Sachin Jaydie

CPSO#: 92623

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Thunder Bay Regional Hospital 980 Oliver Road Thunder Bay, ON P7B 6V4
Date Received: 09 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Western University, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2014