skip to content

Shah, Rupal

CPSO#: 95769

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medicine
399 Bathurst Street
East Wing 8-416
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rupal Shah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shah ( CPSO# 95769 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medicine
399 Bathurst Street
East Wing 8-416
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RUPAL SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015