skip to content

Shah, Prakash Ambalal

CPSO#: 22476

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 May 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 May 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Birmingham, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 May 2006