Shah, Nikhil (CPSO#: 98494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sherbourne Health Centre
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2S5
Phone: 416-324-4180
Fax: 416-324-4181
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shah ( CPSO# 98494 )

Business Address:
Sherbourne Health Centre
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2S5
Phone Number: (416) 324-4100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIKHIL SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014