skip to content

Shah, Chirag Rameshchandra

CPSO#: 89264

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Gujarat University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:11 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 20 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 21 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009