skip to content

Shah, Chintankumar Champaklal

CPSO#: 87401

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:B. J. Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11 & 12
965 Bovaird Dr West
Brampton ON  L6X 5K7
Phone: (905) 497-7779
Fax: (905) 497-7707 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: 9054977779
Fax: 9054977707
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. Shah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Shah ( CPSO# 87401 )

Business Address:
965 Bovaird Drive West
Unit 11 & 12
Brampton ON  L6X 5K7
Phone Number: (905) 497-7779

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHINTANKUMAR CHAMPAKLAL SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 05 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 06 Jul 2008 to 05 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 06 Jul 2009 to 05 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 06 Jul 2010 to 05 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 06 Jul 2011 to 05 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 06 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2013