skip to content

Shah, Archna Suryakant

CPSO#: 97440

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Apr 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
Division of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600 Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatrics Effective:16 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARCHNA SURYAKANT SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 07 May 2012 to 02 Jun 2012
EL - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2012 to 19 Oct 2012
EL - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 26 Oct 2015 to 22 Nov 2015
EL - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2019