skip to content

Shah, Akber

CPSO#: 93187

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Sind Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
384 yonge street unit 5
Barrie ON  L4N 4C9
Phone: 705 7260966 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

16 main street
Markham ON  L3P1X2
Canada
Phone: 905 4715300
Fax: 905 4716130
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Akber Shah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: AKBER SHAH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shah ( CPSO# 93187 )

Business Address:
16 Main St N
Markham ON  L3P 1X2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AKBER SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013