skip to content

Shafi, Sharmi Tangia

CPSO#: 91702

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Oct 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

3227 Eglinton Avenue East
Unit 143-144
Toronto ON  M1J 3M5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Masud Khandaker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shafi ( CPSO# 91702 )
Dr. M. Khandaker ( CPSO# 97619 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch Street
3rd Floor, Cardiology
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 863-2558

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 2E9
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
William Olser Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8


Corporation Name: Sharmi Shafi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shafi ( CPSO# 91702 )
Dr. M. Khandaker ( CPSO# 97619 )

Business Address:
Unit 143-144
3227 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1J 3M5
Phone Number: (647) 447-7394

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2465

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:22 Aug 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHARMI TANGIA SHAFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAFI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2016