skip to content

Shabana, Wael Mansour

CPSO#: 87867

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Nov 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Nov 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Dutch, English

Education:ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Hospital
Department of Radiology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-6111 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W. Shabana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Shabana ( CPSO# 87867 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
Department of Radiology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-6911


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:09 Nov 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Sep 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013 Active
             1.    Dr. Wael Mansour Shabana may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology,  University  of  Ottawa,  in  which Dr. Shabana holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  when Dr.Shabana no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.