skip to content

Shaban, Ahmed Mohamed Sadek Mohamed

CPSO#: 94542

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Compass Community Health
438 Hughson St North
Hamilton ON  L8L 4N5
Phone: (905) 523-6611
Fax: (905) 523-8735 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmed Shaban Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shaban ( CPSO# 94542 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
North Hamilton Community Health Centre
438 Hughson Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 4N5
Phone Number: (905) 523-6611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AHMED MOHAMED SADEK MOHAMED SHABAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHABAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 21 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Jan 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2012