skip to content

Mirmesdagh, Seyedehyalda

CPSO#: 111825

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
77 Provost Drive
Discovery Family Health
Toronto ON  M2K 0B7
Phone: (416) 901 7407
Fax: 416 901 9780 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

7335 Yonge St
Thornhill ON  L3T1P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 707-7309
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Iran

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SEYEDEHYALDA MIRMESDAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRMESDAGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019