skip to content

Seybold, Heather Elizabeth

CPSO#: 32413

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jun 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: Chamberlain, Heather Elizabeth Seybold (used until: 07 Aug 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. H. Elizabeth Seybold Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 28 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER ELIZABETH SEYBOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEYBOLD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1981