skip to content

Sexton, Patrick Hugh

CPSO#: 27757

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Patrick H. Sexton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2011

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 416.398.0638 or 1.888.563.3732 Fax: 877.398.5932
Date Received: 28 Aug 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Oct 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012