skip to content

Sexton, Frederick George

CPSO#: 27795

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jul 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2016

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: October 5, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Frederick George Sexton to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 5, 2015:

Dr. Sexton has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.