skip to content

Sewchand, Kenneth

CPSO#: 24029

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
19 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 May 2021

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On June 13, 2013, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Peterborough, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Sewchand.