skip to content

Severs, Stanley Robert Frederick

CPSO#: 31738

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Sep 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jul 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. R. Severs, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 2020