skip to content

Sethi, Berjinder Jay

CPSO#: 94897

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Sethi, Berjinder (used until: 30 Jul 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hunter Street East
Ground Floor
Hamilton ON  L8N 3W1
Phone: 905-777-7800 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

MedSleep Pembroke
715 MacKay Street, Ground Floor
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
Phone: 613-735-2358
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Carleton Place & District Memorial
MedSleep Carleton Place
211 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 613-257-0061
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Berjinder Jay Sethi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sethi ( CPSO# 94897 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BERJINDER JAY SETHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
EL - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012