Seski, Robert Charles (CPSO#: 92507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Feb 2010

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Mississippi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-1661 Ext. 52226
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4444
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rob Seski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Seski ( CPSO# 92507 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Hospitalist Office
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-1661

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Business Address:
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Robert Charles Seski may practise medicine independently in internal
                  medicine as a hospitalist, only;

                        AND

              2.  Dr. Robert  Charles  Seski  may  practise  internal medicine with Windsor
                  Regional   Hospital   in  Windsor,  Ontario,  while   under   supervision
                  coordinated  by supervisors  acceptable  to  the  College,  and  only  in
                  accordance with the Change of Scope Program approved by the College.

            2.    Dr. Seski will not be the most responsible physician for any patients for
                  his internal medicine practice with Windsor Regional Hospital.

            3.    The authority  to  practice  in  clause  2 automatically expires upon the
                  following   events,  unless  the  Registration   Committee   renews   the
                  certificate with  or  without  additional  or other terms, conditions and
                  limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisors notify the College of  any  concerns  regarding Dr.
                        Seski's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, do not  provide the
                        required  reports to the College by the due date or if the  reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the supervisors  are  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue to
                        supervise Dr. Seski's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) Dr.  Seski  is  no  longer  participating  in  the Change of  Scope
                        program, or
                  
                  (iv)  the College finds the assessment report, pertaining  to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Seski's practice unsatisfactory.