skip to content

Serrano Aybar, Pablo Emilio

CPSO#: 96399

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Costa Rica, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer
Centre
B3 - 161
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 43872
Fax: (905) 540-6519 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. P.E. Serrano Aybar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Serrano Aybar ( CPSO# 96399 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
Suite B3-161
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:01 Jan 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2015 Active
 Dr.  Pablo  Emilio Serrano Aybar may practise medicine independently in general
            surgery.