skip to content

Serra, Stefano

CPSO#: 90231

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Oct 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:UNIVERSITA DEGLI STUDI DI CAGLIARI, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
11E208
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5049 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 Ross Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 360-6024 Ext. 3129
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:02 Oct 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 15 Feb 2009 to 20 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 21 Mar 2009 to 01 Oct 2009
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2015 Active
             Dr. Stefano Serra may practise medicine independently in pathology.