skip to content

Seron, Giselle

CPSO#: 88050

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Feb 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Lawrence-Patel, Giselle Mary Teresa (used until: 17 Dec 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Bangalore University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Square One Medical Mgt Corp
Units 1 and 2
4175 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5B 0H1
Phone: (905) 848-4880
Fax: (905) 848-4882 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Giselle Lawrence-Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 16 2014
Corporation Name: Dr. Giselle Seron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Seron ( CPSO# 88050 )

Business Address:
Dr Giselles Medical Centre
Units 1 & 2
4175 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5B 0H1
Phone Number: (905) 848-4880


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GISELLE SERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SERON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2009