skip to content

Sentongo, Colin

CPSO#: 90468

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kemptville Department Anesthesia
Kemptville Hospital Emergency
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-6133 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Almonte Hospital Emergency Dept.
Almonte Hospital Anesthesia Dept.
Winchester Hospital Anesthesia Dept
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Colin Sentongo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sentongo ( CPSO# 90468 )

Business Address:
Kemptville Emergency Department
2675 Concession Road
PO Box 2007
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. COLIN SENTONGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENTONGO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009