skip to content

Sennik, Vir Bhushan

CPSO#: 24916

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 503
71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone: (905) 848-5744
Fax: (905) 848-0526 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vir Sennik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sennik ( CPSO# 24916 )

Business Address:
503 - 71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 848-5766


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Grand Cayman

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIR BHUSHAN SENNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENNIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1972