skip to content

Senechal, Melanie

CPSO#: 91005

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NHS St Catharines General Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 5 2018
Corporation Name: Dr. M. Senechal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Senechal ( CPSO# 91005 )

Business Address:
NHS St Catharines General Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELANIE SENECHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENECHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2012