skip to content

Selvarajah, Vijeyakumar

CPSO#: 88280

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 333 6203 28th avenue
edmonton T6L6K3

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grey Nuns Hospital
1100 Youville Drive West
Edmonton AB  T6L5X8
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIJEYAKUMAR SELVARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELVARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 06 May 2008 to 02 Jun 2008
EL - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Jul 2008 to 24 Aug 2008
EL - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2020