skip to content

Selvarajah, Prrasonna

CPSO#: 93457

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Mar 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Trust Clinics
Oshawa Health Centre
247 Simcoe Street North 1st Floor
Oshawa ON  L1G 4T3
Phone: (905) 728-7915 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Prrasonna Selvarajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Selvarajah ( CPSO# 93457 )

Business Address:
Medical Trust Clinics
Oshawa Health Centre
247 Simcoe Street North, 1st Floor
Oshawa ON  L1G 4T3
Phone Number: (905) 728-7915

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Oct 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2011 Active
 Dr.   Prrasonna  Selvarajah  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  family
            medicine, only.