skip to content

Seltz, Leonard Barry

CPSO#: 85067

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Wisconsin, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008