Selke, Moira Sarah Anne (CPSO#: 99511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
13069 Keele Street
King City ON  L7B 1G1
Phone: (416) 351-3764
Fax: (416) 323-6130
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Westside Doctors
27 Roncesvalles Avenue Suite 308
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Canada
Phone: (416)5346699
Fax: 4165340172
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Environmental Health Clinic
77 Grenville St. Main floor, Room 1
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Canada
Phone: 416-351-3764
Fax: 416-323-6130
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.S.A. Selke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Selke ( CPSO# 99511 )

Business Address:
13069 Keele Street
King City ON  L7B 1G1
Phone Number: (416) 351-3764

Business Address:
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Suite 308
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 534-6699

Business Address:
107 - 77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone Number: (416) 351-3764

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOIRA SARAH ANNE SELKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2012 to 20 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2014