skip to content

Self, Lauren

CPSO#: 98299

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Administration
Credit Valley Hospital site
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lauren Self Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Berger-Richardson ( CPSO# 98725 )
Dr. L. Self ( CPSO# 98299 )

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAUREN SELF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2014