skip to content

Sekar, Arni Somnathiyer Chandra

CPSO#: 29518

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mysore University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A.S. Sekar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 9 2018
Corporation Name: A.S. Sekar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sekar ( CPSO# 29518 )

Business Address:
Unit 207
267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone Number: (613) 513-7489

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Medical record requests should be directed to: [email protected]
Date Received: 27 Mar 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARNI SOMNATHIYER CHANDRA SEKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEKAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2018
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 09 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2020