Seibel, Jessica Dawn (CPSO#: 95876)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 571-7496
Fax: (519) 954-3489
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Seibel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Seibel ( CPSO# 95876 )

Business Address:
310 - 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 571-7496

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA DAWN SEIBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEIBEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2013 to 25 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013