skip to content

Sehravat, Narinder Singh

CPSO#: 86968

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Maharshi Dayanand University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
1525 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G5
Phone: (416) 740-2274
Fax: (416) 740-6178 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 205
5 Cherry Crest Drive
Brampton ON  L6P 3W4
Canada
Phone: 416-740-2274
Fax: 416-740-6178
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Narinder Singh Sehravat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sehravat ( CPSO# 86968 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
1525 Albion Road
Toronto ON  M9V 5G5
Phone Number: (416) 740-2274

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NARINDER SINGH SEHRAVAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEHRAVAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010