skip to content

Sehr Ansari, Najmus

CPSO#: 98224

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018
EXPIRY DATE
31 Dec 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education (Clinical Fellow) as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Ansari, Najmus Sehr (used until: 07 May 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neonatal-Perinatal
Medicine
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813 7500 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAJMUS SEHR ANSARI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SEHR ANSARI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SEHR ANSARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SEHR ANSARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SEHR ANSARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SEHR ANSARI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. SEHR ANSARI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Dec 2021.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Dec 2021
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2021