skip to content

Sehgal, Anupam Virendra

CPSO#: 96463

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Nagpur University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6262 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anupam Sehgal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sehgal ( CPSO# 96463 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Jul 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Apr 2019 Active
 1.    Dr. Anupam Virendra Sehgal may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Pediatrics, Queen's University, in which Dr. Sehgal holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Sehgal  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Sehgal's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Sehgal's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2016, and expires on June 30, 2022.
                  Upon renewal of Dr. Sehgal's academic appointment at Queen's University,
                  the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs
                  2 and 3 above.