skip to content

Segal, Oliver Robin

CPSO#: 85753

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Jan 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2006 to 15 Jan 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007