Segal, Lauren Miriam (CPSO#: 100843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
770 Broadview Avenue
Suite 306
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 728-5807
Fax: (613) 728-3942
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronnie Borsuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Segal ( CPSO# 100843)
Dr. R. Borsuk ( CPSO# 96720 )

Business Address:
306 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 728-5807

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 26 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 02 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN MIRIAM SEGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2013