skip to content

Seet, Cheun Ping Edwin

CPSO#: 89894

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Singapore, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 07 Nov 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009