skip to content

Seemann, Natashia Martina

CPSO#: 95963

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
Rm B1-192
London ON  N6C 2V5 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Natashia Seemann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Seemann ( CPSO# 95963 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: 519-685-7315

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATASHIA MARTINA SEEMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEEMANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Western University, 26 Aug 2019 to 20 Sep 2019
EL - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2020