skip to content

Seelisch, Jennifer Lynn

CPSO#: 93677

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Children's Hospital
Div'n of Hematology/Oncology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (519) 685-8494 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology Effective:31 Dec 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNN SEELISCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEELISCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2016