skip to content

Sedarat, Franklin

CPSO#: 87409

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 25 Sep 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Tehran, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
Research Fellows - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2007