skip to content

Sebastian, Renee Marie

CPSO#: 98254

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HealthPark Medical Clinics
370 Bayview Drive
Suite 200
Barrie ON  L4N 7L3
Phone: (705) 315-2801
Fax: 705-722-7933 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 7L3
Canada
Phone: 705-728-9090
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Renee Sebastian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sebastian ( CPSO# 98254 )

Business Address:
200-370 Bayview Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 7L3
Phone Number: (705) 315-2801

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RENEE MARIE SEBASTIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEBASTIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014