skip to content

Searle, Howard Gordon

CPSO#: 19459

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Oct 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006