skip to content

Seah, Stanley Kin Kok

CPSO#: 18528

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 16 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Nov 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Hong Kong S A R
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:20 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Sep 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1995
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Aug 2018