skip to content

Scully, Hugh Edwards

CPSO#: 26458

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Hugh E. Scully 318 - 2095 Lakeshore Blvd W Toronto ON M8V 4G4
Date Received: 01 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018